|
09/29/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 779, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6444.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6470.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4827.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4598.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|