LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1711
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1711
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1711
Compare Versions
AB1711 Chaptered September 29, 2014
AB1711 Enrolled August 29, 2014
AB1711 Amended August 21, 2014
AB1711 Amended April 3, 2014
AB1711 Amended March 20, 2014
AB1711 Introduced February 13, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB1711 Chaptered September 29, 2014
AB1711 Enrolled August 29, 2014
AB1711 Amended August 21, 2014
AB1711 Amended April 3, 2014
AB1711 Amended March 20, 2014
AB1711 Introduced February 13, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare