|
09/15/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 330, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6444.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6462.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4762.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4848.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|