California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1712 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 15, 2014

Amended

Bill June 16, 2014
Bill April 8, 2014