|
09/15/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 331, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Enrolled measure version corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 6034.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4363.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 28. Page 4426.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|