BILL NUMBER: AB 1743CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 331 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 15, 2014 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 15, 2014 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 7, 2014 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 14, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 27, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Ting (Coauthor: Senator Monning) FEBRUARY 14, 2014 An act to amend Sections 4144.5, 4145.5, and 4148.5 of, and to repeal Sections 4144, 4145, 4148, and 4149.5 of, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 11364 of, and to repeal Section 11364.1 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1743, Ting. Hypodermic needles and syringes. Existing law, until January 1, 2015, authorizes a pharmacist or physician to furnish 30 or fewer hypodermic needles and syringes for human use to a person 18 years of age or older solely for his or her personal use. This bill would delete that January 1, 2015, date of repeal and would, until January 1, 2021, authorize a pharmacist or physician to provide an unlimited number of hypodermic needles and syringes to a person 18 years of age or older solely for his or her personal use. Under existing law it is unlawful to possess an opium pipe or any device, contrivance, instrument, or paraphanelia used for unlawfully injecting or smoking specified controlled substances. Existing law, until January 1, 2015, exempts from this prohibition the possession of 30 or fewer hypodermic needles and syringes if acquired from an authorized source, and from January 1, 2015, through December 31, 2018, inclusive, exempts from this prohibition possession solely for personal use of 10 or fewer hypodermic needles or syringes if acquired from an authorized source. This bill would, instead, and until January 1, 2021, exempt the possession of any amount of hypodermic needles and syringes that are acquired from an authorized source. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 4144 of the Business and Professions Code is repealed. SEC. 2. Section 4144.5 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 4144.5. A person may sell or obtain hypodermic needles and hypodermic syringes without a prescription or permit, for uses that the board determines are industrial, and that person shall not be required to comply with Section 4145.5 or 4146. SEC. 3. Section 4145 of the Business and Professions Code is repealed. SEC. 4. Section 4145.5 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 4145.5. (a) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, a pharmacist or physician may, without a prescription or a permit, furnish hypodermic needles and syringes for human use, and a person may, without a prescription or license, obtain hypodermic needles and syringes from a pharmacist or physician for human use, if the person is known to the furnisher and the furnisher has previously been provided a prescription or other proof of a legitimate medical need requiring a hypodermic needle or syringe to administer a medicine or treatment. (b) Notwithstanding any other provision of law and until January 1, 2021, as a public health measure intended to prevent the transmission of HIV, viral hepatitis, and other bloodborne diseases among persons who use syringes and hypodermic needles, and to prevent subsequent infection of sexual partners, newborn children, or other persons, a physician or pharmacist may, without a prescription or a permit, furnish hypodermic needles and syringes for human use to a person 18 years of age or older, and a person 18 years of age or older may, without a prescription or license, obtain hypodermic needles and syringes solely for personal use from a physician or pharmacist. (c) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, a pharmacist, veterinarian, or person licensed pursuant to Section 4141 may, without a prescription or license, furnish hypodermic needles and syringes for use on animals, and a person may, without a prescription or license, obtain hypodermic needles and syringes from a pharmacist, veterinarian, or person licensed pursuant to Section 4141 for use on animals, providing that no needle or syringe shall be furnished to a person who is unknown to the furnisher and unable to properly establish his or her identity. (d) A pharmacy that furnishes nonprescription hypodermic needles and syringes shall store hypodermic needles and syringes in a manner that ensures that they are available only to authorized personnel, and are not accessible to other persons. (e) In order to provide for the safe disposal of hypodermic needles and syringes, a pharmacy or hypodermic needle and syringe exchange program that furnishes nonprescription hypodermic needles and syringes shall counsel consumers on safe disposal and provide consumers with one or more of the following disposal options: (1) It shall establish an onsite, safe, hypodermic needle and syringe collection and disposal program that meets applicable state and federal standards for collection and disposal of medical sharps waste. (2) It shall furnish, or make available, mail-back sharps containers authorized by the United States Postal Service that meet applicable state and federal requirements for the transport of medical sharps waste, and shall provide tracking forms to verify destruction at a certified disposal facility. (3) It shall furnish, or make available, a sharps container that meets applicable state and federal standards for collection and disposal of medical sharps waste. (f) Until January 1, 2021, a pharmacy that furnishes nonprescription syringes shall provide written information or verbal counseling to consumers at the time of furnishing or sale of nonprescription hypodermic needles or syringes on how to do the following: (1) Access drug treatment. (2) Access testing and treatment for HIV and hepatitis C. (3) Safely dispose of sharps waste. SEC. 5. Section 4148 of the Business and Professions Code is repealed. SEC. 6. Section 4148.5 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 4148.5. All stocks of hypodermic needles or syringes shall be confiscated if found outside the licensed premises of any person holding a permit under Section 4141 and found not in the possession or under the control of a person entitled to an exemption under Section 4143, 4144.5, or 4145.5, or under Section 11364, 121349, or 121349.1 of the Health and Safety Code. SEC. 7. Section 4149.5 of the Business and Professions Code is repealed. SEC. 8. Section 11364 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 11364. (a) It is unlawful to possess an opium pipe or any device, contrivance, instrument, or paraphernalia used for unlawfully injecting or smoking (1) a controlled substance specified in subdivision (b), (c), or (e) or paragraph (1) of subdivision (f) of Section 11054, specified in paragraph (14), (15), or (20) of subdivision (d) of Section 11054, specified in subdivision (b) or (c) of Section 11055, or specified in paragraph (2) of subdivision (d) of Section 11055, or (2) a controlled substance that is a narcotic drug classified in Schedule III, IV, or V. (b) This section shall not apply to hypodermic needles or syringes that have been containerized for safe disposal in a container that meets state and federal standards for disposal of sharps waste. (c) Until January 1, 2021, as a public health measure intended to prevent the transmission of HIV, viral hepatitis, and other bloodborne diseases among persons who use syringes and hypodermic needles, and to prevent subsequent infection of sexual partners, newborn children, or other persons, this section shall not apply to the possession solely for personal use of hypodermic needles or syringes if acquired from a physician, pharmacist, hypodermic needle and syringe exchange program, or any other source that is authorized by law to provide sterile syringes or hypodermic needles without a prescription. SEC. 9. Section 11364.1 of the Health and Safety Code is repealed.