Assembly | 06/06/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2013 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2013 | Re-referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 24. | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2013 | Read first time. To print. |