LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB177
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB177
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB177
Compare Versions
AB177 Amended January 27, 2014
AB177 Amended January 15, 2014
AB177 Amended January 8, 2014
AB177 Amended January 6, 2014
AB177 Amended June 5, 2013
AB177 Amended April 9, 2013
AB177 Amended March 21, 2013
AB177 Introduced January 24, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB177 Amended January 27, 2014
AB177 Amended January 15, 2014
AB177 Amended January 8, 2014
AB177 Amended January 6, 2014
AB177 Amended June 5, 2013
AB177 Amended April 9, 2013
AB177 Amended March 21, 2013
AB177 Introduced January 24, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare