Senate
|
08/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4974.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (August 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Page 4700.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4735.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 5250.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|