California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1783 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2014

Amended

Bill August 25, 2014
Bill August 18, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014