|
09/28/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 727, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 6045.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4406.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 4955.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2014
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|