California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1826 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 18, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2014

Amended

Bill August 6, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 16, 2014
Bill April 22, 2014
Bill March 24, 2014