|
09/29/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 803, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6571.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 9. Page 6594.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4860.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 15. Page 5105.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 4.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|