LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1840
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1840
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1840
Compare Versions
AB1840 Chaptered September 29, 2014
AB1840 Enrolled September 3, 2014
AB1840 Amended August 22, 2014
AB1840 Amended August 5, 2014
AB1840 Amended July 2, 2014
AB1840 Amended May 8, 2014
AB1840 Amended April 10, 2014
AB1840 Amended March 28, 2014
AB1840 Introduced February 18, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB1840 Chaptered September 29, 2014
AB1840 Enrolled September 3, 2014
AB1840 Amended August 22, 2014
AB1840 Amended August 5, 2014
AB1840 Amended July 2, 2014
AB1840 Amended May 8, 2014
AB1840 Amended April 10, 2014
AB1840 Amended March 28, 2014
AB1840 Introduced February 18, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare