California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1883 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2014

Amended

Bill August 5, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 18, 2014
Bill April 29, 2014
Bill April 10, 2014