LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1883
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1883
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1883
Compare Versions
AB1883 Chaptered September 26, 2014
AB1883 Enrolled August 21, 2014
AB1883 Amended August 5, 2014
AB1883 Amended July 1, 2014
AB1883 Amended June 18, 2014
AB1883 Amended April 29, 2014
AB1883 Amended April 10, 2014
AB1883 Introduced February 19, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB1883 Chaptered September 26, 2014
AB1883 Enrolled August 21, 2014
AB1883 Amended August 5, 2014
AB1883 Amended July 1, 2014
AB1883 Amended June 18, 2014
AB1883 Amended April 29, 2014
AB1883 Amended April 10, 2014
AB1883 Introduced February 19, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare