Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4921.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 5325.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 5349.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 5255.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|