LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1897
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1897
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1897
Compare Versions
AB1897 Chaptered September 28, 2014
AB1897 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB1897 Amended August 22, 2014
AB1897 Amended August 19, 2014
AB1897 Amended July 1, 2014
AB1897 Amended May 28, 2014
AB1897 Amended May 23, 2014
AB1897 Amended April 10, 2014
AB1897 Amended March 28, 2014
AB1897 Introduced February 19, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB1897 Chaptered September 28, 2014
AB1897 Enrolled September 4, 2014
AB1897 Amended August 22, 2014
AB1897 Amended August 19, 2014
AB1897 Amended July 1, 2014
AB1897 Amended May 28, 2014
AB1897 Amended May 23, 2014
AB1897 Amended April 10, 2014
AB1897 Amended March 28, 2014
AB1897 Introduced February 19, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare