|
09/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 566, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6616.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6629.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4896.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 5000.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|