California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1898 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014