California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1915 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 19, 2014
Bill June 25, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014
Bill April 22, 2014
Bill April 1, 2014