LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1915
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1915
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1915
Compare Versions
AB1915 Chaptered September 18, 2014
AB1915 Enrolled September 3, 2014
AB1915 Amended August 22, 2014
AB1915 Amended August 19, 2014
AB1915 Amended June 25, 2014
AB1915 Amended May 23, 2014
AB1915 Amended April 22, 2014
AB1915 Amended April 1, 2014
AB1915 Introduced February 19, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB1915 Chaptered September 18, 2014
AB1915 Enrolled September 3, 2014
AB1915 Amended August 22, 2014
AB1915 Amended August 19, 2014
AB1915 Amended June 25, 2014
AB1915 Amended May 23, 2014
AB1915 Amended April 22, 2014
AB1915 Amended April 1, 2014
AB1915 Introduced February 19, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare