Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 5004.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2014
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|