California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1922 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2014

Amended

Bill June 18, 2014
Bill May 13, 2014
Bill May 1, 2014
Bill March 20, 2014