California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB194 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Amended

Bill August 20, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 17, 2014
Bill January 27, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014