LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB194
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB194
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB194
Compare Versions
AB194 Enrolled September 3, 2014
AB194 Amended August 20, 2014
AB194 Amended July 1, 2014
AB194 Amended June 17, 2014
AB194 Amended January 27, 2014
AB194 Amended January 6, 2014
AB194 Introduced January 28, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB194 Enrolled September 3, 2014
AB194 Amended August 20, 2014
AB194 Amended July 1, 2014
AB194 Amended June 17, 2014
AB194 Amended January 27, 2014
AB194 Amended January 6, 2014
AB194 Introduced January 28, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare