|
08/21/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 234, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4364.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 4831.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4751.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|