California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1965 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 8, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 21, 2014

Amended

Bill May 5, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014