Senate
|
08/06/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 17. Page 5099.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|