California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1971 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2014

Amended

Bill July 2, 2014
Bill June 18, 2014
Bill May 14, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014