|
09/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 537, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4617.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5258.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|