California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1973 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2014

Amended

Bill May 23, 2014
Bill March 20, 2014