California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1993 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2014

Amended

Bill May 27, 2014
Bill April 10, 2014