LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1993
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1993
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1993
Compare Versions
AB1993 Chaptered September 18, 2014
AB1993 Enrolled August 25, 2014
AB1993 Amended May 27, 2014
AB1993 Amended April 10, 2014
AB1993 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB1993 Chaptered September 18, 2014
AB1993 Enrolled August 25, 2014
AB1993 Amended May 27, 2014
AB1993 Amended April 10, 2014
AB1993 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare