|
09/29/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 808, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 28). Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6676.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4501.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4600.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|