California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2010 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2014

Amended

Bill August 11, 2014
Bill June 12, 2014