California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2042 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Amended

Bill June 9, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill March 27, 2014