California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2042 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 06/09/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2042AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 9, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 23, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 21, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 27, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Levine FEBRUARY 20, 2014  An act to amend Section 2989.8 of, and to add Section 2986.55 to, the Civil Code, relating to motor vehicle leases.   An act to add Section 44274.9 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to clean vehicles.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2042, as amended, Levine.  Vehicle Leasing Act: zero-emission vehicles: option to purchase.   Clean Vehicle Rebate Project.   Existing law establishes the Air Quality Improvement Program that is administered by the State Air Resources Board for the purposes of funding projects related to, among other things, reduction of criteria air pollutants and improvement of air quality. Pursuant to the Air Quality Improvement Program, the state board has established the Clean Vehicle Rebate Project to promote the production and use of zero-emission vehicles.   This bill would authorize the state board to establish and maintain a wait list of eligible project applicants, on a first-come-first-served basis, that have not received the rebate because of insufficient funding. The bill would require the state board to disburse rebates to applicants on the wait list if the Legislature appropriates additional moneys for the purposes of the project.   Existing law, the Vehicle Leasing Act, specifies requirements for contracts for leases of motor vehicles, including the requirement that the contract contain prescribed information regarding the motor vehicle and the terms of the lease. Existing law makes a knowing and willful violation of the act's provisions a misdemeanor.   This bill would authorize a lease contract for the lease of a zero-emission vehicle that was counted by the manufacturer toward meeting the requirements of the State Air Resources Board to contain the option for the lessee to purchase the vehicle at the end of the lease term. The bill would provide that, except as specified, a knowing and willful violation of the act is a misdemeanor.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 44274.9 is added to the   Health and Safety Code   , to read:   44274.9. For each fiscal year, if the moneys appropriated by the Legislature for the purposes of the Clean Vehicle Rebate Project, established pursuant to this article, are insufficient to provide rebates to all eligible applicants within that fiscal year, the state board may establish and maintain a wait list of eligible project applicants, on a first-come-first-served basis, that have not received the rebate because of insufficient funding. The state board shall disburse rebates to the applicants on the wait list if the Legislature appropriates additional moneys for the project for that fiscal year or for the fiscal year following that fiscal year.   SECTION 1.   Section 2986.55 is added to the Civil Code, to read: 2986.55. A lease contract for the lease of a zero-emission vehicle that was counted by the manufacturer toward meeting the requirements of the zero-emission vehicle standards of the State Air Resources Board may contain the option for the lessee to purchase the vehicle at the end of the lease term.   SEC. 2.   Section 2989.8 of the Civil Code is amended to read: 2989.8. Except as otherwise provided in this chapter, a person who knowingly and willfully violates any provision of this chapter shall be guilty of a misdemeanor.