California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2057 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2014
Bill August 19, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill July 2, 2014
Bill June 11, 2014
Bill April 3, 2014