LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2057
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2057
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2057
Compare Versions
AB2057 Amended August 22, 2014
AB2057 Amended August 19, 2014
AB2057 Amended August 4, 2014
AB2057 Amended July 2, 2014
AB2057 Amended June 11, 2014
AB2057 Amended April 3, 2014
AB2057 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB2057 Amended August 22, 2014
AB2057 Amended August 19, 2014
AB2057 Amended August 4, 2014
AB2057 Amended July 2, 2014
AB2057 Amended June 11, 2014
AB2057 Amended April 3, 2014
AB2057 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare