|
09/26/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 15. Page 6174.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 4422.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 18. Page 5331.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2014
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|