California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2081 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2014

Amended

Bill August 5, 2014
Bill May 13, 2014
Bill April 22, 2014