|
09/25/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6646.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 6660.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4898.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5295.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. Measure version as amended on April 21 corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|