California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2088 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Amended

Bill August 21, 2014
Bill August 19, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014