California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2137 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 13, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 25, 2014

Amended

Bill August 5, 2014
Bill June 25, 2014
Bill May 15, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014