LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2137
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2137
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2137
Compare Versions
AB2137 Chaptered August 25, 2014
AB2137 Enrolled August 13, 2014
AB2137 Amended August 5, 2014
AB2137 Amended June 25, 2014
AB2137 Amended May 15, 2014
AB2137 Amended May 6, 2014
AB2137 Amended April 21, 2014
AB2137 Amended March 28, 2014
AB2137 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB2137 Chaptered August 25, 2014
AB2137 Enrolled August 13, 2014
AB2137 Amended August 5, 2014
AB2137 Amended June 25, 2014
AB2137 Amended May 15, 2014
AB2137 Amended May 6, 2014
AB2137 Amended April 21, 2014
AB2137 Amended March 28, 2014
AB2137 Introduced February 20, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare