Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 15. Page 5296.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5065.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4633.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|