California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2145 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 12, 2014
Bill April 10, 2014