|
09/23/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 324, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/19/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/17/2013
|
Enrolled measure version corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3093.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2235.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1007.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|