California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB216 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2013

Amended

Bill September 3, 2013
Bill June 19, 2013
Bill June 5, 2013